Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Burton, Phillip [D-CA-5]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/22/1983
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 03/22/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/24/1983
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 03/24/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 03/24/1983
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/28/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/28/1983
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 04/28/1983
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 04/28/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/28/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 04/28/1983
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13] 04/28/1983
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/28/1983
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/28/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 04/28/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/28/1983
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 04/28/1983
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 04/28/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/28/1983
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 04/28/1983
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 04/28/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/28/1983
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 05/09/1983
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 05/09/1983
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/09/1983
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 05/09/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/11/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 05/11/1983
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/11/1983
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 05/11/1983
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/11/1983
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/11/1983
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 05/12/1983
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/12/1983
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 05/12/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/19/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 05/19/1983
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/26/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 05/26/1983
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 05/26/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 05/26/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/26/1983
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 05/26/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/26/1983
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/26/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/22/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 06/22/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/22/1983
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/22/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/22/1983
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2] 06/22/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/22/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/22/1983
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/22/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 06/22/1983
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 06/22/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/22/1983
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/22/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 06/22/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 06/23/1983
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/23/1983
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/23/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/23/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/14/1983
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/14/1983
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/14/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/14/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 07/14/1983
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 07/14/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/14/1983
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 07/14/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/14/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/14/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 07/14/1983
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/14/1983
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 10/04/1983
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 10/04/1983
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/04/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/04/1983
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 10/04/1983
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 10/04/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 10/04/1983
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 10/04/1983
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 10/04/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 10/04/1983
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/04/1983
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 10/04/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/04/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 10/04/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 10/04/1983
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/04/1983
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 10/04/1983
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 10/04/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 11/01/1983
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 11/01/1983
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 11/01/1983
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-19] 11/01/1983
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 11/01/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 11/01/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 11/01/1983

Show cosponsors who withdrew