Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/19/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/19/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/19/1983
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/19/1983
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 04/19/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/19/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 04/19/1983
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 04/19/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 04/19/1983
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/26/1983
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 04/26/1983
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 04/26/1983
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/26/1983
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 04/26/1983
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 04/26/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/26/1983
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 04/26/1983
Rep. Patman, William N. [D-TX-14] 04/26/1983
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 04/26/1983
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6] 05/03/1983
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 05/03/1983
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/03/1983
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 05/03/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/03/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 05/03/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/03/1983
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 05/03/1983
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 05/03/1983
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/12/1983
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/12/1983
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/12/1983
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/12/1983
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/12/1983
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/12/1983
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 05/18/1983
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 05/18/1983
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/18/1983
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/18/1983
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/18/1983
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-22] 05/18/1983
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/02/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/02/1983
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 06/02/1983
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/02/1983
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 06/02/1983
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/02/1983
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 06/02/1983
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 06/02/1983
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/02/1983
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 06/02/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/22/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14] 06/22/1983
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 06/22/1983
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/22/1983
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 06/22/1983
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/22/1983
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/22/1983
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 07/18/1983
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 07/18/1983
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/18/1983
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/18/1983
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/18/1983
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 07/18/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/04/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 08/04/1983
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/13/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/13/1983
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 09/13/1983
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 09/13/1983
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 09/13/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/13/1983
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 09/13/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/13/1983
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/13/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/13/1983
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 09/13/1983
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/13/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 09/27/1983
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 09/27/1983
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 09/27/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 09/27/1983
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 09/27/1983
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 09/27/1983
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/27/1983
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 09/27/1983
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 09/27/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 09/27/1983
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 10/17/1983
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/17/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/17/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 10/17/1983
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 10/17/1983
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 10/17/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 10/17/1983
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 10/17/1983
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/17/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/31/1983
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/31/1983
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/31/1983
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 10/31/1983
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 10/31/1983
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/02/1983
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 11/02/1983
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 11/16/1983
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 11/16/1983
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 11/16/1983
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/16/1983
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 11/16/1983
Rep. Bethune, Ed [R-AR-2] 02/01/1984
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 02/01/1984
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 02/01/1984
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/01/1984
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 02/01/1984
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/01/1984
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 02/01/1984
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 02/01/1984
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 02/01/1984
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 02/01/1984
Rep. Kazen, Abraham, Jr. [D-TX-23] 02/01/1984
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 02/01/1984
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/01/1984
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 02/01/1984
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 02/01/1984
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/01/1984
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/01/1984
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/01/1984
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 02/01/1984
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/01/1984
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4] 02/01/1984
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/13/1984
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 03/13/1984
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 03/13/1984
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/13/1984
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 03/13/1984
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/13/1984
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 03/13/1984
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 03/13/1984
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4] 03/13/1984
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/13/1984
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 03/13/1984
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 05/16/1984
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/16/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/16/1984

Show cosponsors who withdrew