Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to extend by three years the period during which Vietnam-era veterans may request psychological readjustment counseling from the Veterans' Administration and to direct the Administrator of Veterans' Affairs to carry out a comprehensive study of the prevalence of post-traumatic stress disorder and related readjustment problems among Vietnam-era veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/24/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
05/05/1983Clean Bill H.R.2920 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
05/05/1983Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
05/04/1983Executive Comment Received From VA.
04/18/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/18/1983Executive Comment Requested from VA.
03/24/1983Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/1983Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 03/24/1983
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/24/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/24/1983
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/24/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/24/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/24/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 04/13/1983
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/13/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/13/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/19/1983
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 04/19/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/19/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/19/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 04/19/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/19/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/19/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/19/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/19/1983
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 04/19/1983
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 04/19/1983
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/19/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 04/19/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 04/19/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/1983
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 04/19/1983
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/25/1983
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/25/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/25/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/25/1983
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 04/25/1983
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 04/25/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/25/1983
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 04/25/1983
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1] 04/25/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/25/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/25/1983
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/25/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/27/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/27/1983
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/27/1983
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 04/27/1983
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8] 04/27/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/27/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 04/27/1983
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 04/27/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/03/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/03/1983
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/03/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/03/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/03/1983
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/03/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/03/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/17/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/17/1983
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 05/17/1983
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 05/17/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 05/17/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 05/17/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 05/17/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/17/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/17/1983
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/02/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/09/1983
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/09/1983

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/24/1983 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care04/18/1983 Referred to
05/05/1983 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2323. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/24/1983)

Extends by three years, from FY 1984 to FY 1987, the period during which Vietnam-era veterans may request psychological readjustment counseling from the Veterans Administration.

Directs the Administrator of Veterans Affairs to conduct a comprehensive study of the readjustment of Vietnam-era veterans to civilian life. Requires that such study include a nationwide survey of the prevalence and incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder and related readjustment problems among such veterans and a survey of their health status in relation to that of the general population.

Directs the Administrator to report to Congress on such study by December 31, 1985.