Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to delay implementation of the requirement that States allow tandem trailer trucks on Interstate highways and designated primary highways, to establish procedures for exempting certain of those highways from that requirement, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/12/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
07/31/1984For Further Action See H.R.5568.
11/18/1983Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From OMB.
11/01/1983Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From DOT.
05/13/1983Executive Comment Requested from DOT, OMB.
04/25/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
04/12/1983Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/1983Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation04/12/1983 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation04/25/1983 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2497. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/1983)

Amends the Surface Transportation Assistance Act of 1982 to exempt designated Interstate System and Federal-aid primary system highways from the requirement that States allow commercial motor vehicle combinations consisting of a truck tractor and two trailing units (double bottom trucks) to operate on such highways. Directs the Secretary of Transportation to grant such exemption for safety considerations and highway structural integrity. Sets forth the procedure for States to obtain such exemption.

Prohibits States from imposing a vehicle length limitation of less than 28 feet on semitrailers or trailers of double bottom trucks operating on exempted highways.

Directs the Secretary to provide for a study of the effects of double bottom trucks on the Interstate Highway System. (Currently the Secretary monitors such effects). Requires a report to the Secretary and Congress on the results of such study not later than January 31, 1985.