Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 05/11/1983
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 05/11/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/12/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/12/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/12/1983
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/12/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/12/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/12/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 05/17/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/17/1983
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/17/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/17/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/19/1983
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 05/19/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 05/19/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/25/1983
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/25/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/25/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/25/1983
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/25/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/25/1983
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/02/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 06/02/1983
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 06/02/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/07/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/07/1983
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/07/1983
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 06/15/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/15/1983
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 06/21/1983
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/21/1983
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/22/1983
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 06/23/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/29/1983
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/29/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/25/1983
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/25/1983
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 07/28/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/28/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 07/28/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/03/1983
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 09/12/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 09/12/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/12/1983
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 09/12/1983
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 09/15/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 09/15/1983
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 09/15/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 10/06/1983
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/18/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 10/24/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/25/1983
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 11/08/1983
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/09/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/10/1983
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 11/14/1983
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 01/23/1984
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 01/23/1984
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/23/1984
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/08/1984
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 02/08/1984
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 02/29/1984
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/20/1984
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/20/1984
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/28/1984
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 04/04/1984
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/02/1984
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/07/1984
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/10/1984
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 06/19/1984
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/29/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/01/1984

Show cosponsors who withdrew