Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to make certain changes in the authority of the Office of Government Ethics, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
09/19/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/16/1983Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 98-89 (Part II).
05/05/1983Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-89 (Part I).
04/25/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date All Actions
09/19/1983Other Measure S.461 (Amended) Passed House in Lieu.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/19/1983Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/19/1983Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/19/1983Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/16/1983Placed on Union Calendar No: 122.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/16/1983Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 98-89 (Part II).
05/11/1983Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
05/11/1983Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
05/05/1983Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-89 (Part I).
04/28/1983Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Human Resources
04/28/1983Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Human Resources
04/26/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
04/26/1983Ordered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/26/1983Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/25/1983Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/1983Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/1983Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary04/25/1983 Referred to
04/26/1983 Markup by
05/05/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-89 Part 1
House Post Office and Civil Service04/25/1983 Referred to
05/11/1983 Markup by
05/16/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-89 Part 2
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Human Resources04/26/1983 Referred to
04/28/1983 Markup by
04/28/1983 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2717. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/19/1983)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Amends the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to authorize the Director of the Office of Government Ethics (OGE), in consultation with the Office of Personnel Management (OPM), to issue regulations pertaining to conflicts of interest and ethics in the executive branch. (Currently, the Director may only recommend rules for promulgation by OPM or the President.)

Directs the President to: (1) include in each annual Government budget transmitted to Congress the estimated expenditures and proposed appropriations necessary to support OGE for the next five fiscal years; and (2) include in each statement of changes in budget authority, expenditures, or receipts the effect of such changes on OGE funding.

Includes certain high level White House aides among those officials whose financial disclosure reports must be transmitted to the Director. Limits the outside earned income of such individuals for a calendar year to 15 percent of their salary for such year.

Requires a presidential nominee to update his or her financial report by the date of the first Senate confirmation hearing with respect to income and honoraria received as of five days before such hearing. Permits an individual whose nomination the President or President-elect has publicly announced to file such financial report at any time after such announcement but not later than five days before such hearing.

Requires an individual to notify the designated agency official, OGE, or a Senate confirmation committee upon completing actions the individual agrees to take to comply with this Act or other laws or regulations governing conflicts of interest or establishing standards of conduct for Federal employees and officials. Requires the individual to make such notification by the date specified for completion of action in the agreement or, if no date is specified, within three months after the agreement is made. Directs an individual who agrees to recuse himself or herself from particular categories of official action to: (1) reduce to writing those subjects to which the agreement applies and the process for determining whether such individual must recuse himself or herself in a specific instance; and (2) file a document setting forth such information with the designated agency official, OGE, or the appropriate Senate committee by the time prescribed by such agreement or within three months after such agreement is made if no time is prescribed.

Revises the conditions a trust must satisfy to be considered a qualified blind trust which is exempt from certain reporting requirements of the Ethics in Government Act of 1978. Includes among the new conditions a requirement that the supervising ethics office determine that approval of the trust as a qualified blind trust is necessary and appropriate to assure compliance with applicable ethics laws and regulations. Repeals the requirement that a reporting individual file a copy of the trust instrument and a list of the trust's assets and their value with the supervising ethics office within 30 days of its approval as a qualified blind trust.

Requires certain individuals who perform staff functions for Federal advisory committees composed of one or more special Government employees to file financial disclosure reports.

Extends the authorization of appropriations for OGE for five years.