Committees: H.R.2717 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary04/25/1983 Referred to
04/26/1983 Markup by
05/05/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-89 Part 1
House Post Office and Civil Service04/25/1983 Referred to
05/11/1983 Markup by
05/16/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-89 Part 2
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Human Resources04/26/1983 Referred to
04/28/1983 Markup by
04/28/1983 Reported by