Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Product Liability Act of 1983

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for a uniform product liability law.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/25/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/02/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/25/1983Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/1983Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 04/25/1983
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/26/1983
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 07/26/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14] 07/26/1983
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 07/26/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/26/1983
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/26/1983
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 07/26/1983
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/26/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/26/1983
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/26/1983
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/26/1983
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/26/1983
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 07/26/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/26/1983
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 07/26/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/26/1983
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9] 07/26/1983
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/26/1983
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/26/1983
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 07/26/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 07/26/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 09/19/1983
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 09/19/1983
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/19/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 09/19/1983
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/19/1983
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/19/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 09/19/1983
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/08/1984
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/19/1984
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/19/1984
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 06/21/1984
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 07/26/1983 11/02/1983 --
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 09/19/1983 09/28/1983 --
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/19/1983 10/01/1984 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/25/1983 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/02/1983 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2729.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2729. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/1983)

Product Liability Act of 1983 - Sets forth uniform national standards for products liability cases.

Preempts inconsistent Federal and State laws. Permits actions under this Act to be brought in State court or Federal court if the United States is a party or diversity jurisdiction exists.

Prohibits recovery for other than commercial loss or damage to the product itself, except as otherwise provided in this Act.

Sets forth basic standards of responsibility for manufacturers and product sellers other than manufacturers including wholesalers, distributors, retailers, lessors, packagers, and repairers.

Establishes rules relating to proof in products liability cases with respect to Federal Government standards and contract specifications.

Prohibits admission of postmanufacturing improvements except for the purpose of impeaching a witness for the product seller who denies the feasibility of such improvements. Allows a manufacturer to introduce certain precautionary measures.

Provides that all product liability actions shall be governed by the principles of comparative responsibility. Specifies the manner in which damages are to be apportioned. Provides that comparative damages apply only to compensatory damages.

Requires the reduction of any damage award by the amount of workers' compensation benefits which are paid.

Makes a product seller who acted with flagrant indifference to consumer safety, where the act was an extreme departure from accepted practice, liable for punitive damages.

Establishes a two-year statute of limitations and a ten-year statute of repose.