Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 04/25/1983
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/26/1983
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 07/26/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14] 07/26/1983
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 07/26/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/26/1983
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/26/1983
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 07/26/1983
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/26/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/26/1983
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/26/1983
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/26/1983
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/26/1983
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 07/26/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/26/1983
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 07/26/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/26/1983
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9] 07/26/1983
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/26/1983
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/26/1983
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 07/26/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 07/26/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 09/19/1983
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 09/19/1983
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/19/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 09/19/1983
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/19/1983
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/19/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 09/19/1983
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/08/1984
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/19/1984
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/19/1984
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 06/21/1984

Show cosponsors who withdrew