Committees: H.R.2733 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture04/26/1983 Referred to
05/03/1983 Markup by
05/12/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-109 Part 1
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture04/27/1983 Referred to
04/27/1983 Markup by
04/27/1983 Reported by
House Science and Technology04/26/1983 Referred to
05/10/1983 Markup by
05/16/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-109 Part 2
House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Science, Research and Technology05/03/1983 Referred to
05/05/1983 Markup by
05/05/1983 Reported by
05/06/1983 Discharged from
House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agricultural Research and Environment05/03/1983 Referred to
05/06/1983 Discharged from
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry05/19/1983 Referred to
06/21/1983 Markup by
06/23/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-164