Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to increase to the level of funds authorized to be appropriated for the fiscal years 1982, 1983, and 1984 to permit adequate reimbursement for meals served under the Older Americans Act of 1965.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/24/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 386 - 31 (Record Vote No: 133).
05/16/1983Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Education and Labor. Report No: 98-164.
04/28/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/07/1983SenateCommittee on Labor and Human Resources requested executive comment from Health and Human Services Department, GAO, OMB.
06/07/1983SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Aging (Labor and Human Resources).
Action By: Committee on Labor and Human Resources
05/26/1983SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
05/24/1983HousePassed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 386 - 31 (Record Vote No: 133).
05/23/1983HouseConsidered by House Unfinished Business Vote Postponed Until May 24, 1983.
05/23/1983HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/16/1983HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 102.
05/16/1983HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Education and Labor. Report No: 98-164.
05/10/1983HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
05/10/1983HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
05/10/1983HouseSubcommittee on Human Resources Discharged.
Action By: House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources
05/09/1983HouseExecutive Comment Requested from HHS.
05/06/1983HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
04/28/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
04/28/1983HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor04/28/1983 Referred to
05/10/1983 Markup by
05/16/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-164
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources05/06/1983 Referred to
05/10/1983 Discharged from
Senate Labor and Human Resources05/26/1983 Referred to
Senate Labor and Human Resources Subcommittee on Aging06/07/1983 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2807.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2807. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/24/1983)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #133 (386-31))

Amends the Older Americans Act of 1965 to authorize appropriations to provide additional reimbursement to maintain the programmed level of cost per meal served during FY 1982 under the surplus commodities meal program.

Increases the authorization of appropriations for FY 1983 for the program. Authorizes the appropriation of such sums as may be necessary for the program for FY 1984.