Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title I of the Reclamation Project Authorization Act of 1972 in order to provide for the establishment of the Russell Lakes Waterfowl Management Area as a replacement for the authorized Mishak National Wildlife Refuge, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/30/1984Became Public Law No: 98-570.
10/30/1984Signed by President.
10/18/1984Presented to President.
10/10/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/09/1984Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/01/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/21/1984House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries Discharged by Motion.
09/13/1984Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 98-1020 (Part I).
04/28/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
10/30/1984Became Public Law No: 98-570.
10/30/1984Signed by President.
10/18/1984HousePresented to President.
10/15/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/10/1984SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/09/1984SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1342.
10/09/1984SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/02/1984SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
10/01/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/01/1984HouseCalled up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
09/25/1984HousePlaced on Consent Calendar No: 58.
09/21/1984HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 589.
09/21/1984HouseHouse Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries Discharged by Motion.
09/13/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later Than Sep 21, 84.
09/13/1984HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 98-1020 (Part I).
08/08/1984HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
08/08/1984HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/31/1984HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources
07/31/1984HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources
05/31/1984HouseFavorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
04/03/1984HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources
05/16/1983HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
05/10/1983HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
04/28/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
04/28/1983HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs04/28/1983 Referred to
08/08/1984 Markup by
09/13/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-1020 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources05/10/1983 Referred to
04/03/1984 Hearings by
07/31/1984 Markup by
07/31/1984 Reported by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries09/13/1984 Referred to
09/21/1984 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works10/02/1984 Referred to
10/09/1984 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.2823.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2823. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/01/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Amends the Reclamation Project Authorization Act of 1972 to include among the purposes of the closed basin division, San Luis Valley project in Colorado: (1) the establishment of the Russell Lakes Waterfowl Management Area; and (2) the furnishing of a water supply for such area by purchasing the necessary lands and a partial water supply for the operation of the Blanca Wildlife Habitat area and the Alamosa National Wildlife Refuge. Repeals the establishment of the Mishak National Wildlife Refuge under such Act.

Requires that the Secretary of the Interior establish such project according to engineering plans as modified by the plans shown in the Fish and Wildlife Plan dated June 1982.

Provides that the maintenance of the Alamosa National Wildlife Refuge and the Blanca Wildlife Habitat Area shall be second on the priority list for the supply of water from the project. Prohibits the amount of project salvaged water delivered to the refuge and the habitat area from exceeding 5,300 acre-feet annually.

Permits private lands required for permanent project facilities, at the option of the United States, to be acquired by fee title.