Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 04/28/1983
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/28/1983
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 05/24/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/24/1983
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/24/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/24/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/24/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/24/1983
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 05/24/1983
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/1983
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/24/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/24/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/24/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/24/1983
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/24/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/24/1983
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 05/24/1983
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/24/1983
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 05/24/1983
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 05/24/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/06/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/06/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/06/1983
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/06/1983
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/06/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/06/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/14/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/14/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/14/1983
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/1983
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/14/1983
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/14/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/14/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/14/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/14/1983
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/14/1983
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 06/14/1983
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/14/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/14/1983
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/14/1983
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 06/14/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/14/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/23/1983
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/23/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 06/23/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/23/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/1983
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/23/1983
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 06/23/1983
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 06/23/1983
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/23/1983
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/23/1983
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/23/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 06/23/1983
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4] 07/12/1983
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/12/1983
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/12/1983
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/12/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/12/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 07/12/1983
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/12/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/28/1983
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 07/28/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 07/28/1983
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 08/01/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 08/01/1983
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 08/01/1983
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 08/01/1983
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 08/01/1983
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 08/01/1983
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/04/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 08/04/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/04/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/04/1983
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 08/04/1983
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/04/1983
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 09/13/1983
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 09/13/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/13/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 09/13/1983
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 09/13/1983
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 09/20/1983
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 09/20/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/17/1983
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/17/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/17/1983
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 10/17/1983
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 10/17/1983
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 10/17/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/17/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/17/1983
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 10/17/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/17/1983
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 10/20/1983
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/20/1983
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 10/20/1983
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 11/12/1983
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/12/1983
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/18/1983
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 11/18/1983
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 01/24/1984
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 01/24/1984
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 02/01/1984
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/08/1984
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 02/08/1984
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/08/1984
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 03/01/1984
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 03/01/1984
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/01/1984
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 03/01/1984
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 03/06/1984
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/06/1984
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 03/08/1984
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/08/1984
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 03/14/1984
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/14/1984
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 03/15/1984
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 03/22/1984
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/02/1984
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/1984
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 04/04/1984
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 04/04/1984
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/04/1984
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 04/10/1984
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 04/25/1984
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/25/1984
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 04/25/1984
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/01/1984
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/08/1984
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/08/1984
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/10/1984
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/24/1984
Rep. Britt, Robin [D-NC-6] 06/07/1984
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 06/14/1984
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/21/1984
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/21/1984
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/26/1984