Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Oceans Policy Commission Act of 1983

Short Titles as Reported to House for portions of this bill
  • National Ocean Policy Commission Act of 1983
  • National Oceans Policy Commission Act of 1983

Short Titles as Introduced

National Ocean Policy Commission Act of 1983

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to establish a National Oceans Policy Commission to make recommendations to Congress and the President on a comprehensive national oceans policy.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
10/31/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/19/1983Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 98-339 (Part III).
09/19/1983Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Foreign Affairs. Report No: 98-339 (Part II).
08/01/1983Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-339 (Part I).
05/02/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/15/1984HouseFor Further Action See S.1098.
11/02/1983SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
10/31/1983HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/31/1983HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
10/19/1983HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 255.
10/19/1983HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 98-339 (Part III).
10/05/1983HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
10/05/1983HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
10/04/1983HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining, Forest Management and Bonneville Power Administration
10/04/1983HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining, Forest Management and Bonneville Power Administration
10/04/1983HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining, Forest Management and Bonneville Power Administration
09/30/1983HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Mining, Forest Management and Bonneville Power Administration.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
09/30/1983HouseFavorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
09/19/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later than Oct 19, 83.
09/19/1983HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Foreign Affairs. Report No: 98-339 (Part II).
08/02/1983HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
08/02/1983HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
08/01/1983HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-339 (Part I).
07/26/1983HouseExecutive Comment Received From Interior.
07/11/1983HouseExecutive Comment Received From State.
06/28/1983HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/28/1983HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/27/1983HouseExecutive Comment Received From Justice.
06/24/1983HouseFavorable Executive Comment Received From State.
06/07/1983HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/17/1983HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
05/11/1983HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD, Commerce, State.
05/10/1983HouseExecutive Comment Requested from State, Commerce, Interior, GSA, EPA, Marine Mammal Comm, Justice.
05/02/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
05/02/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/02/1983HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs05/02/1983 Referred to
06/07/1983 Hearings by
08/02/1983 Markup by
09/19/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-339 Part 2
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries05/02/1983 Referred to
05/17/1983 Hearings by
06/28/1983 Markup by
08/01/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-339 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs09/19/1983 Referred to
10/05/1983 Markup by
10/19/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-339 Part 3
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining, Forest Management and Bonneville Power Administration09/30/1983 Referred to
10/04/1983 Hearings by
10/04/1983 Markup by
10/04/1983 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/02/1983 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2853. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/31/1983)

(Measure passed House, amended)

National Oceans Policy Commission Act of 1983 - Establishes a 19-member National Oceans Policy Commission to make a recommendation on a comprehensive national oceans policy.

Specifies issues such recommendations must address.

Sets forth factors the Commission must take into account in developing its recommendations.

Directs the Commission to make a final report to the President and to each House of the Congress not later than two years after the Commission first meets.

Terminates the Commission on the thirtieth day after the final report is submitted.

Authorizes appropriations for FY 1984 and FY 1985.