Committees: H.R.2853 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs05/02/1983 Referred to
06/07/1983 Hearings by
08/02/1983 Markup by
09/19/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-339 Part 2
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries05/02/1983 Referred to
05/17/1983 Hearings by
06/28/1983 Markup by
08/01/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-339 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs09/19/1983 Referred to
10/05/1983 Markup by
10/19/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-339 Part 3
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining, Forest Management and Bonneville Power Administration09/30/1983 Referred to
10/04/1983 Hearings by
10/04/1983 Markup by
10/04/1983 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/02/1983 Referred to