Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Housing Benefits Amendments of 1983

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Housing Benefits Amendments of 1983

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Housing Benefits Amendments of 1983

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Administrator of Veterans' Affairs to provide mortgage assistance to veterans with loans guaranteed by the Veterans' Administration in order to avoid foreclosure of such loans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/24/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 394 - 23 (Record Vote No: 132).
05/13/1983Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 98-118.
05/09/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
05/26/1983SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
05/24/1983HousePassed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 394 - 23 (Record Vote No: 132).
05/23/1983HouseConsidered by House Unfinished Business Vote Postponed Until May 24, 1983.
05/23/1983HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/13/1983HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 67.
05/13/1983HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 98-118.
05/10/1983HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
05/10/1983HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/09/1983HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.2664.
05/09/1983HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.2618.
05/09/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/09/1983HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/09/1983 Referred to
05/10/1983 Markup by
05/13/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-118
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/26/1983 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2948. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/24/1983)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #132 (394-23))

Veterans' Housing Benefits Amendments of 1983 - Authorizes the Administrator of Veterans Affairs to make advances to the holder of a veteran's primary mortgage when such veteran: (1) is living in the dwelling concerned; (2) is unemployed or suffered a substantial reduction in household income; (3) is at least six months delinquent in payments; and (4) has a reasonable prospect of being able to resume full payments within six months. Sets limits on the amount of assistance which may be advanced. Requires the veteran to repay the advance with interest at the rate specified by the Administrator for veterans' guaranteed loans within 48 months.

Makes the Administrator's decisions regarding advances final and nonreviewable.

Terminates the advance program after two years.

Authorizes the Administrator to make guaranteed loans to eligible veterans for manufactured homes permanently affixed to a lot.

Permits the Administrator to exclude from the computation of a veteran's aggregate guaranty or insurance entitlement any amount taken over by any veteran-transferee, not just an immediate veteran-transferee, who consents to use his own entitlement.

Extends by five years, through FY 1989, the Administrator's grants to States to assist in the establishment or improvement of State veterans' cemeteries.

Authorizes the Administrator to make contributions to local authorities for the construction of traffic controls or other improvements or devices necessary for safe ingress to or egress from a national cemetery.