Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize reimbursement for the reasonable charge for chiropractic services provided to certain veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/12/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/12/1983Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/1983Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (129)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 06/15/1983
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 06/15/1983
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/29/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/29/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 06/29/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/29/1983
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 06/29/1983
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 06/29/1983
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/29/1983
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/29/1983
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/29/1983
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/29/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/29/1983
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8] 06/29/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 07/26/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/26/1983
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/26/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/26/1983
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/26/1983
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-19] 07/26/1983
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/26/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 07/26/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 07/26/1983
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 07/26/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 07/26/1983
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/26/1983
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/26/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14] 07/26/1983
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/29/1983
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/29/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/29/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/29/1983
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/29/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/04/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 08/04/1983
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 08/04/1983
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 09/19/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/19/1983
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 09/19/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/19/1983
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 09/19/1983
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/19/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/19/1983
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/19/1983
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 09/19/1983
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 09/19/1983
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2] 09/19/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/19/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 09/19/1983
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-17] 09/19/1983
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 09/19/1983
Rep. Britt, Robin [D-NC-6] 09/19/1983
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 09/19/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/19/1983
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/26/1983
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 10/26/1983
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 10/26/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/26/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 10/26/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 10/26/1983
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 10/26/1983
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 10/26/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 01/24/1984
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 01/24/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 01/24/1984
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 01/24/1984
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/24/1984
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 01/24/1984
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 01/24/1984
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/24/1984
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 01/24/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/24/1984
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 01/24/1984
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 01/24/1984
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 01/24/1984
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/24/1984
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 02/08/1984
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 02/08/1984
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 02/08/1984
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 02/08/1984
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 02/08/1984
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 02/08/1984
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 02/08/1984
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 03/14/1984
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/14/1984
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11] 03/14/1984
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 03/14/1984
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 03/14/1984
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4] 08/06/1984
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 08/06/1984
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 08/06/1984
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 08/06/1984
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/06/1984
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 08/06/1984
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 08/06/1984
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 10/02/1984
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 10/02/1984
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 10/02/1984
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/02/1984
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 10/02/1984
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 10/02/1984
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 10/02/1984
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/02/1984

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/12/1983 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3016.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3016. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/12/1983)

Authorizes the Administrator of Veterans Affairs to reimburse eligible veterans for reasonable charges for chiropractic services. Directs the Administrator to establish a schedule of reasonable charges. Requires the Administrator to make annual reports to the Veterans Affairs Committees for four years concerning the use and reimbursement of chiropractic services.