Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perkins, Carl Dewey [D-KY-7]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 06/16/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/12/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/12/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/12/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/12/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/12/1983
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/12/1983
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/12/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/12/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/12/1983
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 07/12/1983
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 07/12/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 07/12/1983
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/12/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/12/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 07/12/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/12/1983
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 07/12/1983
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/12/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/12/1983
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/12/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/12/1983
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 07/12/1983
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/12/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/12/1983
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/12/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/12/1983
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 07/12/1983
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 07/12/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/12/1983
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4] 07/12/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 07/12/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/12/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/12/1983
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 07/12/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/12/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/12/1983
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/12/1983
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8] 07/12/1983
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/12/1983
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/12/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/20/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/20/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/20/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/20/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/20/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 07/20/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 07/20/1983
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/20/1983
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 07/20/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/20/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/29/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 07/29/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/29/1983
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/29/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 08/02/1983
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 08/04/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 09/14/1983
Rep. Britt, Robin [D-NC-6] 09/14/1983
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/14/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/14/1983
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/29/1983
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/29/1983
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 09/29/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 09/29/1983
Rep. Erlenborn, John N. [R-IL-13] 09/29/1983
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 09/29/1983
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 09/29/1983
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 09/30/1983
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 09/30/1983
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 09/30/1983
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/30/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 09/30/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 09/30/1983
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 09/30/1983
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 09/30/1983
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 09/30/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/30/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/30/1983
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 09/30/1983
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 09/30/1983
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 09/30/1983
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 09/30/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/30/1983
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/30/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 09/30/1983
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 09/30/1983
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 09/30/1983
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13] 09/30/1983