Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/30/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 06/30/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/27/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/27/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 09/27/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/27/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 09/27/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/27/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 09/27/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/27/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/27/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/27/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 09/27/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/27/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 09/27/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 09/27/1983
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 09/27/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/27/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 09/27/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 09/27/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 09/27/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/27/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/27/1983
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 09/27/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 09/27/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/27/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/27/1983
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 09/27/1983
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 09/27/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 09/27/1983
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/27/1983
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 09/27/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/27/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/27/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 09/27/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/27/1983
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/27/1983
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/1983
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 09/27/1983
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/27/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 09/27/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 09/27/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/27/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/27/1983
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/27/1983
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 09/27/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/27/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/27/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/27/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/27/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/27/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 09/27/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 09/27/1983
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/10/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 11/10/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 11/10/1983
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 11/10/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 11/10/1983
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 11/10/1983
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 11/10/1983
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 11/10/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 11/10/1983
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 11/10/1983
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/10/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 11/10/1983
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 11/18/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 11/18/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 11/18/1983
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/21/1984
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/21/1984
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/21/1984
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 02/21/1984
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/21/1984
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 02/21/1984
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/14/1984
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/14/1984
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/30/1984