Summary: H.R.3929 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (10/21/1983)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 98-428)

Federal Supplemental Compensation Amendments of 1983 - Title I: Extension of Federal Supplemental Compensation Program - Amends the Federal Supplemental Compensation Act of 1982 to extend the payment of benefits under the Federal supplemental unemployment compensation program for 18 months, through March 31, 1985.

Revises provisions for determining the number of weeks for which such benefits are payable to an individual or in a State.

Provides that the amount established in an individual account shall be the equal of the lesser of: (1) 55 percent of the total amount of regular compensation (including dependents' allowances) payable to the individual with respect to the benefit year (as determined under State law) on the basis of which the individual received compensation; or (2) specified applicable limits (during certain State unemployment periods) times the individual's average weekly benefit for the benefit year. Provides for the following applicable limits on weeks of such benefits: (1) 14 weeks in States with an insured unemployment rate (IUR) of six percent or greater (a "six-percent period"); (2) 12 weeks for an IUR between five and six percent (a "five-percent period"); (3) ten weeks for an IUR between four and five percent (a "four-percent period"); and (4) eight weeks for an IUR less than four percent (a "low-unemployment period"). Sets forth formulas for determining the type of unemployment period for which a State qualifies. Provides for "reach-back" and "transitional" benefits for certain individuals.

Directs the Secretary of Labor to require modifications of agreements with States under such Act to conform to amendments made by this Act within a specified period.

Title II: Other Provisions - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to conform the Federal Unemployment Tax Act (FUTA) definition of taxable wages with the social security tax definition for purposes of determining whether Federal supplemental compensation payments made to estates or survivors of deceased individuals should be subject to the FUTA unemployment tax.

Extends the exemption of wages paid to certain alien farmworkers from FUTA unemployment taxation for two additional years, until January 1, 1986.

Directs the Secretary of Labor to report to the Congress by April 1, 1984, on the feasibility of: (1) using area triggers in unemployment compensation programs; and (2) determining whether individuals filing claims for unemployment compensation are structurally unemployed.

Amends the Social Security Act to increase the amount of the allotment to a State for FY 1984 or any succeeding fiscal year under the title XX program of block grants to States for social services.

Amends the Social Security Act to require that direct repayment of general revenue advances. Requires that amounts appropriated as repayable advances be repaid, without interest, by transfers from the Federal unemployment account to the general fund of the Treasury, at such times as the amount in such account is adequate for such purpose, as determined by the Secretary of the Treasury in consultation with the Secretary of Labor.

Provides that any amounts transferred from the Federal unemployment account to the employment security administration account as of September 30, 1983, shall be transferred back to the Federal unemployment account.

Directs the Secretary of Labor, the Director of the Office of Personnel Management, and the Attorney General to enter into arrangements to make available to States computer or other data regarding current and retired Federal employees and Federal prisoners so that States may review the eligibility of these individuals for unemployment compensation and take action where appropriate. Directs the Secretary to report, with recommendations for further legislation, to the Congress, before January 31, 1984, on such arrangements and any arrangements which could be entered into with other appropriate State agencies, to ensure that unemployment compensation is not paid to retired individuals or prisoners in violation of law.

Authorizes the Secretary of Education to provide financial assistance to the Maureen and Mike Mansfield Foundation to assist in the development of the Mansfield Center for Pacific Affairs and the Maureen and Mike Mansfield Center at the University of Montana. Authorizes appropriations for such purposes.