Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Motor Vehicle Theft Law Enforcement Act of 1983

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to enhance the detection of motor vehicle theft and to improve the prosecution of motor vehicle theft by requiring the Secretary of Transportation to issue a standard relating to the identification of vehicle parts and components, by increasing criminal penalties applicable to trafficking in stolen vehicles and parts, by curtailing the exportation of stolen motor vehicles and off-highway mobile equipment, and by establishing penalties applicable to the dismantling of vehicles for the purpose of trafficking in stolen parts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/27/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date All Actions
09/18/1984For Further Action See H.R.6257.
10/07/1983Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
10/06/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
09/29/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/28/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/28/1983Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance
09/28/1983Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance
09/27/1983Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1983Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1983Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/27/1983Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1983Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1983Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (20)


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs09/27/1983 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade10/07/1983 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/27/1983 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance09/27/1983 Referred to
09/28/1983 Markup by
09/28/1983 Reported by
House Judiciary09/27/1983 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Justice09/28/1983 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service09/27/1983 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization10/06/1983 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/27/1983 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade09/29/1983 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3999. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/1983)

Motor Vehicle Theft Law Enforcement Act of 1983 - Title I: Improved Identification for Motor Vehicle Parts and Components - Amends the Motor Vehicle Information and Cost Savings Act to direct the Secretary of Transportation to promulgate a Federal motor vehicle theft prevention standard applicable to parts used in the manufacture of motor vehicles (other than motorcycles), or manufactured as new replacement parts, after the effective date of such standard.

Directs the Secretary to conduct a cost-benefit analysis before promulgating such standard, including an evaluation of the effect on domestic motor vehicle production and sales.

Stipulates that the standard shall not: (1) impose additional costs upon manufacturers in excess of $10 per motor vehicle; or (2) require the identification of more than 14 parts for any motor vehicle, nine parts for any truck, or four parts for any trailer.

Sets forth compliance provisions for manufacturers of passenger motor vehicles or of passenger motor vehicle equipment. Specifies civil and criminal penalties for violations of this Act.

Declares that a Federal motor vehicle standard supercedes any State or local standard.

Authorizes the Secretary to conduct studies on the development of security devices and systems. Directs the Secretary to report to Congress on such devices and systems within one year of enactment.

Provides for repeal of this title on a specified date.

Title II: Antifencing Measures - Amends the Federal criminal code to establish penalties for removing or altering any identification number of any motor vehicle or motor vehicle part required by regulation. Requires the forfeiture of any vehicle or part which has had such number removed, with specified exceptions. Applies to the seizure and forfeiture of motor vehicles and parts those provisions of law relating to the seizure and forfeiture of vessels and merchandise under the customs laws.

Establishes penalties for anyone who buys, receives, possesses, or obtains control of, with intent to sell or otherwise dispose of, any motor vehicle or motor vehicle part knowing that such identification number has been removed or altered.

Designates as nonmailable matter any manipulative type device which is designed or adapted to operate, circumvent, remove, or render inoperative the ignition switch or lock, or door or trunk lock of two or more motor vehicles, or any advertisement for the sale of such device.

Title III: Importation and Exportation Measures - Establishes criminal and civil penalties for anyone who imports, exports, or attempts to import or export any motor vehicle, off-highway vehicle or vehicle part knowing that it has been stolen or that its identification number has been altered.

Amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to require persons who export or attempt to export a used motor vehicle or off-highway mobile equipment to present to the appropriate customs officers the vehicle and a document describing that vehicle.

Authorizes customs officers to exchange information concerning such vehicles with law enforcement organizations.

Title IV: Reporting Requirements - Directs the Secretary of Transportation to establish a task force to study problems relating to motor vehicle titling and controls over motor vehicle salvage which may affect the motor vehicle theft problem.

Directs the Attorney General, in consultation with the Secretaries of the Treasury and Transportation and the Postmaster General, to report to Congress on the implementation of this Act.