Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/23/1984
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/23/1984
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 04/12/1984
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 04/12/1984
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 04/12/1984
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/12/1984
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/12/1984
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/08/1984
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 09/19/1984