Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 10/20/1983
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 10/20/1983
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 10/20/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/20/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 10/20/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 10/20/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3]* 10/20/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/20/1983
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 10/28/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/28/1983
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/28/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 10/28/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 10/28/1983
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 10/28/1983
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/15/1983
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 11/15/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 11/15/1983
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 11/18/1983
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 11/18/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 01/26/1984
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 01/26/1984
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 01/26/1984
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9] 01/26/1984
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 01/26/1984
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 01/26/1984
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/26/1984
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 01/26/1984
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 01/26/1984
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 01/26/1984
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 01/26/1984
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 01/26/1984
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/26/1984
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 01/26/1984
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 01/26/1984
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 01/31/1984
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 01/31/1984
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 01/31/1984
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 01/31/1984
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/31/1984
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 01/31/1984
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 01/31/1984
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 01/31/1984
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/31/1984
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 01/31/1984
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/08/1984
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/08/1984
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/08/1984
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 02/08/1984
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/08/1984
Rep. Conable, Barber B., Jr. [R-NY-30] 02/08/1984
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 02/08/1984
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 02/08/1984
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 02/08/1984
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/08/1984
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/08/1984
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 02/08/1984
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 02/08/1984
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 02/08/1984
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 02/08/1984
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 02/08/1984
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 02/08/1984
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/01/1984
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 03/01/1984
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/01/1984
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 03/01/1984
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 03/01/1984
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 03/01/1984
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 03/01/1984
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 03/01/1984
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/01/1984
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14] 03/01/1984
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/01/1984
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 03/22/1984
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 03/22/1984
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/22/1984
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 03/22/1984
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/22/1984
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 03/28/1984