Summary: H.R.4101 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/06/1983)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Amends the Federal Supplemental Compensation Act of 1982 to extend the payment of benefits under the Federal supplemental unemployment compensation program for one month, through October 18, 1983.

Amends the Social Security Act to extend until December 7, 1983 the period for which the provisions continuing payment of social security disability benefits during appeal are applicable.

Amends the Adoption Assistance and Child Welfare Act of 1980 to extend for one year, through October 1, 1984, specified provisions relating to Federal payments for dependent children voluntarily placed in foster care.

Delays by two years the application of specified amendments made by the Social Security Amendments of 1983. Provides that remuneration received by retired Federal judges for continuing to perform judicial services shall not be treated as wages for social security tax purposes until January 1, 1986.

Amends the Social Security Act to make a technical amendment relating to the repayment of cash flow loan advances from the unemployment insurance trust fund by State unemployment insurance funds.