Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3]* 10/31/1983
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 10/31/1983
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-22]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Hightower, Jack E. [D-TX-13]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Edwards, Jack [R-AL-1]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4]* 10/31/1983
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 11/01/1983
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/01/1983
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 11/01/1983
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 11/01/1983
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 11/01/1983
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 11/01/1983
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 11/01/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 11/01/1983
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 11/01/1983
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 11/01/1983
Rep. Moore, W. Henson [R-LA-6] 11/01/1983
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 11/01/1983
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 11/01/1983
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-19] 11/01/1983
Rep. Conable, Barber B., Jr. [R-NY-30] 11/01/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/01/1983
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 11/01/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 11/01/1983
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/01/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 11/01/1983
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11] 11/01/1983
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 11/01/1983
Rep. Kazen, Abraham, Jr. [D-TX-23] 11/01/1983
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 11/01/1983
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 11/01/1983
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 11/02/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 11/02/1983
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 11/02/1983
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 11/02/1983
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 11/02/1983
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 11/02/1983
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 11/02/1983
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/02/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/02/1983
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 11/02/1983
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 11/02/1983
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 11/02/1983
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 11/02/1983
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/02/1983
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/02/1983
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 11/02/1983
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 11/02/1983
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 11/02/1983
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 11/02/1983
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 11/02/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 11/02/1983
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 11/02/1983
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/02/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/02/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 11/02/1983
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 11/02/1983
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 11/02/1983
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 11/03/1983
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 11/03/1983
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 11/03/1983
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 11/03/1983
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/03/1983
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 11/03/1983
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 11/03/1983
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 11/03/1983
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 11/03/1983
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 11/03/1983
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 11/03/1983
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 11/03/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 11/03/1983
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 11/03/1983
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 11/03/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 11/08/1983
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 11/08/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/08/1983
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/08/1983
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 11/08/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 11/08/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 11/08/1983
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 11/08/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 11/08/1983
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 11/08/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 11/08/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/08/1983
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 11/08/1983
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 11/08/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 11/08/1983
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/08/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/08/1983
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/08/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 11/08/1983
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 11/08/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 11/08/1983
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 11/08/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 11/09/1983
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 11/09/1983
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/09/1983
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 11/09/1983
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/09/1983
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 11/09/1983
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/14/1983
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/14/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 11/14/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 11/14/1983
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 11/14/1983
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 11/14/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 11/14/1983
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 11/14/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 11/14/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 11/14/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 11/14/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 11/15/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 11/15/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 11/16/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 11/16/1983
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/16/1983
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 11/16/1983
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 11/18/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 01/23/1984
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/23/1984
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 01/23/1984
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 01/23/1984
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 01/23/1984
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 01/23/1984
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 01/31/1984