Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 10/25/1983
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 10/27/1983
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 10/27/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 10/27/1983
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 10/27/1983
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/27/1983
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 10/27/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 10/27/1983
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 10/27/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/27/1983
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 10/27/1983
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 10/27/1983
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11] 10/27/1983
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 10/27/1983
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 10/27/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 10/27/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 10/27/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 10/27/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 10/27/1983
Rep. Perkins, Carl Dewey [D-KY-7] 10/27/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 10/27/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/27/1983
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/27/1983
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 10/27/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 10/27/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 10/27/1983
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 11/01/1983
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 11/01/1983
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 11/01/1983
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 11/01/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 11/03/1983
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/03/1983
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 11/03/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 11/03/1983
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 11/03/1983
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 11/03/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 11/03/1983
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 11/03/1983
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 11/03/1983
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 11/03/1983
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 11/03/1983
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 11/03/1983
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 11/03/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/03/1983
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 11/03/1983
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 11/03/1983
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/03/1983
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 11/03/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 11/03/1983
Rep. Erlenborn, John N. [R-IL-13] 11/03/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 11/03/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/03/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 11/03/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 11/03/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/03/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 11/03/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 11/03/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/03/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/03/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 11/03/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 11/03/1983
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 11/03/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 11/03/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/03/1983
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 11/03/1983
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/03/1983
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 11/03/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 11/03/1983
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 11/03/1983
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/03/1983
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/03/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 11/03/1983
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 11/03/1983
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 11/03/1983
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 11/03/1983
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-17] 11/03/1983
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 11/03/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 11/03/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/09/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 11/09/1983
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 11/09/1983
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 11/09/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 11/09/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 11/09/1983
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 11/09/1983
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 11/09/1983
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 11/09/1983
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 11/09/1983
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 11/09/1983
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 11/09/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/09/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 11/09/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 11/09/1983
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4] 11/09/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 11/09/1983
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 11/09/1983
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 11/09/1983
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 11/09/1983
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 11/09/1983
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 11/09/1983
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 11/09/1983
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 11/09/1983
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 11/09/1983
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/09/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 11/09/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 11/09/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 11/09/1983
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/09/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 11/09/1983
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 11/09/1983
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 11/09/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 11/09/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/09/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 11/09/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 11/09/1983
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/09/1983