There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to name the Veterans' Administration Medical Center in Altoona, Pennsylvania, the "James E. Van Zandt Veterans' Administration Medical Center", and to name the Veterans' Administration Medical Center in Dublin, Georgia, the "Carl Vinson Veterans' Administration Medical Center".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
11/30/1983Became Public Law No: 98-190.
11/30/1983Signed by President.
11/23/1983Presented to President.
11/18/1983Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
11/17/1983Senate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/08/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
11/03/1983Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 98-481.
11/03/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/30/1983Became Public Law No: 98-190.
11/30/1983Signed by President.
11/23/1983HousePresented to President.
11/22/1983SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
11/18/1983SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
11/17/1983SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 628.
11/17/1983SenateSenate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/10/1983SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
11/08/1983HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
11/08/1983HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
11/03/1983HouseReported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 98-481.
11/03/1983HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/03/1983HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/03/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/03/1983HousePlaced on House Calendar No: 128.
11/03/1983HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 11/03/1983
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 11/03/1983
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 11/03/1983
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 11/03/1983

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs11/03/1983 Referred to
11/03/1983 Markup by
11/03/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-481
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/10/1983 Referred to
11/17/1983 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4294.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4294. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/03/1983)

Designates the Veterans Administration Medical Center in Altoona, Pennsylvania, as the James E. Van Zandt Veterans Administration Medical Center.

Designates the Veterans Administration Medical Center in Dublin, Georgia, as the Carl Vinson Veterans Administration Medical Center.