Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/1983
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 01/24/1984
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 01/24/1984
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/24/1984
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/24/1984
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/24/1984
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 01/24/1984
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 01/24/1984
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 01/24/1984
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 01/24/1984
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/24/1984
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 01/24/1984
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 01/24/1984
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 01/24/1984
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/24/1984
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 01/24/1984
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 01/24/1984
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/24/1984
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/24/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/24/1984
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 01/30/1984
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 01/30/1984
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 01/30/1984
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 02/01/1984
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/01/1984
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/01/1984
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 02/01/1984
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 02/01/1984
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/01/1984
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 02/01/1984
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/01/1984
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/01/1984
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 02/06/1984
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/06/1984
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/06/1984
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/06/1984
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 02/06/1984
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/06/1984
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 02/06/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 02/06/1984
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/06/1984
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/06/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/06/1984
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/06/1984
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/21/1984
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 02/21/1984
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 02/21/1984
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/21/1984
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 02/21/1984
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 02/21/1984
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/21/1984
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/21/1984
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 02/21/1984
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 02/21/1984
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 02/21/1984
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/21/1984
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/21/1984
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/22/1984
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 02/22/1984
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 02/22/1984
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/22/1984
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/28/1984
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/28/1984
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 02/28/1984
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/28/1984
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/28/1984
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/28/1984
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/28/1984
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 02/28/1984
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 02/29/1984
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 02/29/1984
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/29/1984
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/29/1984
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 02/29/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 03/01/1984
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 03/01/1984
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/01/1984
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/05/1984
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/05/1984
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/05/1984
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 03/06/1984
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 03/06/1984
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/07/1984
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/07/1984
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/07/1984
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 03/13/1984
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/13/1984
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 03/13/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/13/1984
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/13/1984
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/13/1984
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/14/1984
Rep. Britt, Robin [D-NC-6] 03/14/1984
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/14/1984
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/20/1984
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 03/20/1984
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 03/28/1984
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/28/1984
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/28/1984
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 03/28/1984
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/28/1984
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/28/1984
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/28/1984
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 03/28/1984
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/28/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/28/1984
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/28/1984
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/28/1984
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 04/10/1984
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 04/10/1984
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 04/10/1984
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 04/10/1984
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/10/1984
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/11/1984
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 04/11/1984
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/11/1984
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 04/11/1984
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/12/1984
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/12/1984
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 04/12/1984
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 04/25/1984
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/25/1984
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/25/1984
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 04/25/1984
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/25/1984
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 04/25/1984
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/25/1984
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/15/1984
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/15/1984
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/1984
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/15/1984
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 05/15/1984
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/31/1984
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/31/1984
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 05/31/1984
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/20/1984
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 07/24/1984
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/27/1984
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 07/27/1984
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/12/1984
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/12/1984
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/12/1984
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 09/12/1984