Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perkins, Carl Dewey [D-KY-7]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large]* 11/17/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 11/17/1983
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/17/1983
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Edwards, Jack [R-AL-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 11/17/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/06/1984
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/06/1984
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 02/06/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 02/06/1984
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/06/1984
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/06/1984
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/06/1984
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 02/06/1984
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 02/06/1984
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/06/1984
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/06/1984
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 02/06/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/06/1984
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/06/1984
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 02/06/1984
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/06/1984
Rep. Britt, Robin [D-NC-6] 02/06/1984
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/29/1984
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11] 04/03/1984
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 04/25/1984