Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/27/1984
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large]* 03/27/1984
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/10/1984
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/10/1984
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/10/1984
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 04/10/1984
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/10/1984
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 04/10/1984
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/10/1984
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 04/10/1984
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 04/10/1984
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 04/10/1984
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/10/1984
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 04/10/1984
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/10/1984
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/10/1984
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 04/10/1984
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14] 04/24/1984
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 04/24/1984
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/24/1984
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/24/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/24/1984
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/24/1984
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/24/1984
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/24/1984
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 05/03/1984
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 05/03/1984
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/03/1984
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/03/1984
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/03/1984
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 05/03/1984
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 05/03/1984
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 05/03/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/03/1984
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 05/03/1984
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/03/1984
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/03/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/03/1984
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 05/03/1984
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 05/03/1984
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/03/1984
Rep. Patman, William N. [D-TX-14] 05/03/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/03/1984
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/1984
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/30/1984