Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the United States Armed Forces from participating in additional joint military exercises with the armed forces of Honduras and to place a ceiling on the number of members of the United States Armed Forces who may be in Honduras.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/02/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/10/1984Referred to Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/10/1984Referred to Subcommittee on International Security and Scientific Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/02/1984Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/1984Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/02/1984
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 02/02/1984
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 02/07/1984
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/07/1984
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 02/07/1984
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/07/1984
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 02/07/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/07/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/07/1984
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/07/1984
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 02/07/1984
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 02/22/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 02/22/1984
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/22/1984
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 03/14/1984
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/14/1984
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 03/14/1984
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/14/1984
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/14/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/14/1984
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/14/1984
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/03/1984
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 04/03/1984

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/02/1984 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Security and Scientific Affairs02/10/1984 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs02/10/1984 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4745.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4745. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/1984)

Prohibits U.S. armed forces from participating in joint military exercises with Honduran armed forces during the period beginning 30 days after enactment of this Act or on April 1, 1984, (whichever is later) and ending September 30, 1985. Limits the number of members of the U.S. armed forces in Honduras during such time to 200. Prohibits obligating or spending appropriations contrary to this Act.