Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for the selection of additional lands for inclusion within the Bon Secour National Wildlife Refuge.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
07/09/1984Became Public Law No: 98-347.
07/09/1984Signed by President.
06/27/1984Presented to President.
06/21/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/19/1984Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Stafford without amendment. Without written report.
04/30/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/25/1984Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-703.
02/23/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/09/1984Became Public Law No: 98-347.
07/09/1984Signed by President.
06/27/1984HousePresented to President.
06/26/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/21/1984SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/19/1984SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 998.
06/19/1984SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Stafford without amendment. Without written report.
06/19/1984SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/02/1984SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
04/30/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/30/1984HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
04/25/1984HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 399.
04/25/1984HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-703.
04/11/1984HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
04/11/1984HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
04/05/1984HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
04/05/1984HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
02/29/1984HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
02/29/1984HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
02/23/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
02/23/1984HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries02/23/1984 Referred to
04/11/1984 Markup by
04/25/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-703
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment02/29/1984 Referred to
04/05/1984 Markup by
04/05/1984 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works05/02/1984 Referred to
06/19/1984 Markup by
06/19/1984 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4921.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4921. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/30/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Provides for the selection of additional lands in Alabama for inclusion within the Bon Secour National Wildlife Refuge.

Amends the Federal Aid in Wildlife Restoration Act to make American Samoa eligible for wildlife restoration work and hunter safety programs.