Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Religious Speech Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide that no Federal educational funds may be obligated or expended to any State or local educational agency which discriminates against any meetings of students in public secondary schools who wish to meet voluntarily for religious purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/01/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
04/05/1984For Further Action See H.R.5345.
04/04/1984Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education
04/04/1984Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education
03/28/1984Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education
03/27/1984Executive Comment Requested from Education.
03/12/1984Referred to Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
03/01/1984Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/01/1984Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (29)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/01/1984 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education03/12/1984 Referred to
03/28/1984 Hearings by
04/04/1984 Markup by
04/04/1984 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4996. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/01/1984)

Religious Speech Protection Act - Prohibits federally funded public secondary schools which allow non-school-sponsored groups of students to meet from discriminating against any meeting of students on the basis of religious content if: (1) the meeting is voluntary and student initiated; (2) there is no government sponsorship; and (3) no unlawful activity is permitted.