Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Joint Research and Development Act of 1984

Short Titles as Reported to House

Joint Research and Development Act of 1984

Short Titles as Introduced

Joint Research and Development Act of 1984

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to promote research and development, encourage innovation, and make necessary and appropriate amendments to the antitrust laws.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/01/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 417 - 0 (Record Vote No: 110).
04/06/1984Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-656.
03/06/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/09/1984HouseHouse Incorporated H.R.5041 into S.1841 as an Amendment.
05/03/1984SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
05/01/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 417 - 0 (Record Vote No: 110).
05/01/1984HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
04/06/1984HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 374.
04/06/1984HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-656.
03/20/1984HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/20/1984HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/06/1984HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.4963.
03/06/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
03/06/1984HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (22)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/06/1984 Referred to
03/20/1984 Markup by
04/06/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-656
Senate Judiciary05/03/1984 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5041. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/01/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #110 (417-0))

Joint Research and Development Act of 1984 - Declares that no joint research and development venture shall be deemed illegal per se under the Federal antitrust laws or under any similar State law. Excludes from the term "joint research and development venture" any activity in which two or more participating parties: (1) exchange information regarding the sales, marketing, or distribution of any product, process, or service; or (2) restrict or require the participation by any party in another research and development program, the production or marketing by any party of any product, process, or service, or the sale, licensing, or sharing by any party of any invention or development neither developed by such venture nor integrally related to a product or process developed by such venture.

Permits any party to a joint research and development venture to file with the Attorney General and the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) a written notice disclosing: (1) the parties to such venture; and (2) the nature, objectives, and duration of the venture. Directs the Attorney General or the FTC, within 60 days after receiving such notice, to publish in the Federal Register a notice identifying the parties to such venture and the area of planned activity and duration of such venture. Exempts material submitted as part of such notices from public disclosure.

Limits the amount that may be recovered on a claim brought by a person or by a State on behalf of its residents for an injury to business or property sustained as a result of a violation of a State or Federal antitrust law, to the amount of the actual damages sustained, interest on such damages from the date the action is filed or from the date of injury, as specified, and the cost of the suit, if: (1) the claim is based on conduct under a joint research and development venture that is described in the venture notice filed with the Attorney General and the FTC; and (2) such claim is filed after such notice is published in the Federal Register. Provides that such recovery limitation shall not apply to any conduct that occurs during the effective period of any court order enjoining such conduct as a result of a claim under Federal or State antitrust law. Directs the court to award the prevailing party on such claim the cost of litigation, including reasonable attorney's fees. Provides that such award may be reduced or withheld in the interest of justice, or reduced by an award in favor of any other party.