Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Kazen, Abraham, Jr. [D-TX-23]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Britt, Robin [D-NC-6]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23]* 03/07/1984
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 03/07/1984
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 03/20/1984
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/20/1984
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/20/1984
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/20/1984
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/20/1984
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/20/1984
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 03/20/1984
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 03/20/1984
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 03/20/1984
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/20/1984
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/20/1984
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/20/1984
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/27/1984
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3] 03/27/1984
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/27/1984
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/27/1984
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/27/1984
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/27/1984
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 03/27/1984
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/27/1984
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 03/27/1984
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/27/1984
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/03/1984
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/03/1984
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/03/1984
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/03/1984
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/03/1984
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/03/1984
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/03/1984
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/03/1984
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 04/03/1984
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/03/1984
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8] 04/03/1984
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 04/04/1984
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/04/1984
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 04/04/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/04/1984
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/04/1984
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/04/1984
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/04/1984
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/04/1984
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/04/1984
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 04/04/1984
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 04/04/1984
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 04/04/1984
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/04/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/04/1984
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/04/1984
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 04/04/1984
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/04/1984
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/04/1984
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/10/1984
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 04/10/1984
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Bethune, Ed [R-AR-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/10/1984
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/10/1984
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/11/1984
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/11/1984
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/11/1984
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/11/1984
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 04/12/1984
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 04/12/1984
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/12/1984
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 04/12/1984
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 04/12/1984