Committees: H.R.5164 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Intelligence (Permanent)03/15/1984 Referred to
04/11/1984 Markup by
05/01/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-726 Part 1
House Government Operations03/15/1984 Referred to
07/31/1984 Markup by
09/10/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-726 Part 2
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Government Information, Justice, and Agriculture03/26/1984 Referred to
05/10/1984 Hearings by
07/25/1984 Markup by
07/25/1984 Reported by