There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to designate the United States Courthouse Building in Hato Rey Puerto Rico, as the "Clemente Ruiz Nazario Courthouse".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/30/1984Became Public Law No: 98-589.
10/30/1984Signed by President.
10/18/1984Presented to President.
10/11/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/26/1984Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Stafford without amendment. Without written report.
08/09/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/01/1984Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 98-931.
04/03/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/30/1984Became Public Law No: 98-589.
10/30/1984Signed by President.
10/18/1984HousePresented to President.
10/15/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/11/1984SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/26/1984SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1238.
09/26/1984SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Stafford without amendment. Without written report.
09/26/1984SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
08/09/1984SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
08/09/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/09/1984HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/1984HousePlaced on Consent Calendar No: 52.
08/01/1984HousePlaced on House Calendar No: 246.
08/01/1984HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 98-931.
07/31/1984HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
07/31/1984HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
06/14/1984HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
06/14/1984HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
06/14/1984HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
04/16/1984HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
04/03/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
04/03/1984HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Public Works and Transportation04/03/1984 Referred to
07/31/1984 Markup by
08/01/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-931
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds04/16/1984 Referred to
06/14/1984 Hearings by
06/14/1984 Markup by
06/14/1984 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works08/09/1984 Referred to
09/26/1984 Markup by
09/26/1984 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5323.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5323. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/09/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Designates the U.S. Courthouse Building in Hato Rey, Puerto Rico, as the Clemente Ruiz Nazario United States Courthouse.