Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Education and Employment Amendments of 1984

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Education and Employment Amendments of 1984

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide a 15 percent increase in the rates of educational assistance paid under the GI bill and the rates of subsistence allowances paid under the Veterans' Administration rehabilitation program for veterans with service-connected disabilities, and to revise and extend the veterans' readjustment appointments program for the appointment of veterans in the civil service.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/06/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/15/1984Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 98-775.
04/09/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
08/08/1984SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
08/06/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/06/1984HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
07/25/1984SenateCommittee on Veterans. Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs incorporated provisions of measure into S. 2736 ordered to be reported.
05/15/1984HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 449.
05/15/1984HouseReported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 98-775.
05/10/1984HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/10/1984HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/09/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/09/1984HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1]* 04/09/1984
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 04/09/1984
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 04/09/1984

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/09/1984 Referred to
05/10/1984 Markup by
05/15/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-775
Senate Veterans' Affairs08/08/1984 Referred to
07/25/1984 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5398.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5398. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/06/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Veterans' Education and Employment Amendments of 1984 - Title I: 15 Percent Increase in Rates - Increases Vietnam era veterans' educational assistance, including assistance for survivors and dependents, by 15 percent. Revises the formula for the reimbursement of administrative expenses to State and local agencies who monitor educational institutions attended by GI bill veterans to increase such allowance.

Increases the subsistence allowance rate under the vocational rehabilitation program.

Title II: Veterans' Employment in Civil Service - Extends veterans' readjustment appointments in the Federal Government up to and including the GS-11 level (currently fixed at GS-7). Grants a Vietnam veteran so appointed and terminated within the year the same right of appeal to the Merit Systems Protection Board as is held by a career or career-conditional employee during the first year of employment. Extends such appointments through FY 1987 (currently through FY 1984). Requires the Office of Personnel Management's annual report to Congress on veterans' readjustment appointments to breakdown by agency the number and grade of appointments, the number converted to career or career-conditional appointments, and the number and categories of causes of termination. Requires such report to breakdown such information for all veterans, with a separate breakdown for veterans of the Vietnam era who are disabled.

Title III: Miscellaneous - Amends the Emergency Veterans' Job Training Act of 1983 to extend from 60 to 90 days the duration of a certificate issued by the Administrator of Veterans Affairs for an eligible veteran's presentation to an employer offering a job training program under such Act. Extends the availability of FY 1985 appropriations through FY 1987.

Terminates such job training assistance for applications after May 29, 1985, or for programs beginning after September 1, 1985.