Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Adolescent Pregnancy and Parenthood Act of 1984

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to revise and extend title XX of the Public Health Service Act to provide services for pregnant adolescents and adolescent parents.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/26/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/15/1984For Further Action See H.R.5600.
05/01/1984Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/26/1984Hearings Held by Subcommittee on Health and the Environment Prior to Referral on (Apr 27, 84).
04/26/1984Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/1984Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/03/1984
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/23/1984
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/23/1984
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/23/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/23/1984
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/23/1984
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 05/23/1984
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 05/23/1984
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/23/1984
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 05/23/1984
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 05/23/1984
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/23/1984
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/23/1984
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/23/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/23/1984
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/23/1984
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/23/1984
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/19/1984
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/12/1984
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/12/1984
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/12/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/12/1984
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/12/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/26/1984

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/26/1984 Referred to
04/26/1984 Hearings by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/01/1984 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5534. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/1984)

Adolescent Pregnancy and Parenthood Act of 1984 - Amends title XX (Adolescent Family Life Demonstration Projects) of the Public Health Service Act to authorize grants and projects for: (1) prenatal and postpartum care; (2) well-child infant care; (3) comprehensive family planning services to prevent unintended repeat pregnancies; and (4) educational, vocational, and other counseling services.

Gives priority to under-18 year olds where the incidence of adolescent child bearing is high, where the proportion of low income and minority families is high, and where such services are most needed.

Stresses the role of voluntary family support.

States that services provided under this Act shall be voluntary.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to: (1) establish a program data reporting system; and (2) report annually to Congress.

Authorizes FY 1985 through 1987 appropriations.