Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to direct the Architect of the Capitol and the District of Columbia to enter into an agreement for the conveyance of certain real property, to direct the Secretary of the Interior to permit the District of Columbia and the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority to construct, maintain, and operate certain transportation improvements on Federal property, and to direct the Architect of the Capitol to provide the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority access to certain real property.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
07/03/1984Became Public Law No: 98-340.
07/03/1984Signed by President.
06/27/1984Presented to President.
06/21/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/11/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/11/1984House Committee on House Administration Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/31/1984Reported to House by House Committee on District of Columbia. Report No: 98-810 (Part I).
05/02/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/03/1984Became Public Law No: 98-340.
07/03/1984Signed by President.
06/27/1984HousePresented to President.
06/26/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/21/1984SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/14/1984SenateHeld at the desk by unanimous consent. Pending further disposition.
06/13/1984SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/11/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/11/1984HouseCalled up by House as D.C. Business.
06/11/1984HouseHouse Committee on House Administration Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/11/1984HouseH.Amdt.845 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Voice Vote.
06/11/1984HouseH.Amdt.845 Amendment Offered by Representative Fauntroy.
05/31/1984HouseReported to House by House Committee on District of Columbia. Report No: 98-810 (Part I).
05/03/1984HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on District of Columbia
05/03/1984HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on District of Columbia
05/02/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
05/02/1984HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.4153.
05/02/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on District of Columbia.
05/02/1984HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 05/02/1984

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House District of Columbia05/02/1984 Referred to
05/03/1984 Markup by
05/31/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-810 Part 1
House Administration05/02/1984 Referred to
06/11/1984 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5565. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/11/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Directs the Architect of the Capitol and the District of Columbia to enter into an agreement for the conveyance of real property to the United States for the relocation of the United States Botanic Garden's Poplar Point Greenhouse and Nursery. Directs that the District of Columbia convey the Lanham Tree Nursery to the Secretary of the Interior (Secretary) on behalf of the United States.

Provides that, within 60 days of the enactment of this Act, the real property known as the Botanic Garden Greenhouse and Nursery at Poplar Point shall come within the jurisdiction of the Secretary. Directs the Secretary to permit the District of Columbia and the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority to construct, maintain, and operate certain transportation improvements on such real property. Directs the Architect of the Capitol to provide the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority access to real property transferred to the United States for the purposes of conducting any and all necessary surveys, studies, evaluations and tests for the purpose of constructing a rail line tunnel.