Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sex Discrimination in the United States Code Reform Act of 1983

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the laws of the United States to eliminate gender-based distinctions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/02/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/09/1984Referred to Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/02/1984Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/1984Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (93)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 05/02/1984
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/07/1984
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/07/1984
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/07/1984
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/1984
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/07/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/07/1984
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/07/1984
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/07/1984
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 05/07/1984
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/07/1984
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/07/1984
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/07/1984
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/07/1984
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/07/1984
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 05/07/1984
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/07/1984
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 05/07/1984
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 05/07/1984
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/07/1984
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/07/1984
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/07/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/07/1984
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/07/1984
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 05/07/1984
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/16/1984
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/16/1984
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/16/1984
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/16/1984
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 05/16/1984
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 05/16/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/16/1984
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/16/1984
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8] 05/16/1984
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/16/1984
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/16/1984
Rep. Conable, Barber B., Jr. [R-NY-30] 05/16/1984
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/30/1984
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/30/1984
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/30/1984
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/30/1984
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/30/1984
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 05/30/1984
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/30/1984
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/30/1984
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/30/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/26/1984
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 06/26/1984
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/26/1984
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/26/1984
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 06/26/1984
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/26/1984
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/29/1984
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 06/29/1984
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 06/29/1984
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/29/1984
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 06/29/1984
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 06/29/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/29/1984
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 06/29/1984
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 06/29/1984
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/29/1984
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/29/1984
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/29/1984
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 06/29/1984
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/29/1984
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 07/24/1984
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 07/24/1984
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/24/1984
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 07/24/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/24/1984
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/24/1984
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 07/24/1984
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/24/1984
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/24/1984
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11] 07/24/1984
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/01/1984
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3] 08/01/1984
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 08/01/1984
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/01/1984
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 08/01/1984
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 08/01/1984
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 08/01/1984
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 08/01/1984
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 08/01/1984
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 08/01/1984
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/10/1984
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 08/10/1984
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 08/10/1984
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 08/10/1984
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/06/1984
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 09/18/1984
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 09/18/1984

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/02/1984 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights05/09/1984 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5569.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5569. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/02/1984)

Sex Discrimination in the United States Code Reform Act of 1983 - Title I: Armed Forces, Soldiers' Home, Coast Guard, Lighthouse Service, and Merchant Marine - Amends Federal laws dealing with the Army, the Navy, the Air Force, and the Coast Guard to eliminate gender-based distinctions.

Title II: Elimination of Gender-Based Distinctions Under the Social Security Act and the Railroad Retirement Act - Eliminates gender-based distinctions in the social security and railroad retirement programs.

Title III: Amendments to United States Code - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act, the Walsh-Healey Act, the Child Nutrition Act of 1966, the Federal criminal code and other Acts (dealing with Indian affairs, transportation, public lands, Saint Elizabeth's Hospital, contract law, the U.S. Coast Guard, the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, longshoremen and harbor workers, conservation programs, internee benefits, and the spouses of former presidents, among other subjects) to eliminate gender-based distinctions.

Title IV: Effective Date - Sets forth the effective date for the provisions of this Act.