Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to permit aliens lawfully admitted for permanent residence who are employed by the American University of Beirut to return to the United States as special immigrants after completion of such employment.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/30/1984Became Private Law No: 98-53.
10/30/1984Signed by President.
10/18/1984Presented to President.
10/10/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/04/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
10/04/1984House Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
10/30/1984Became Private Law No: 98-53.
10/30/1984Signed by President.
10/18/1984HousePresented to President.
10/15/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/10/1984SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/05/1984SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/04/1984HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
10/04/1984HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/1984HouseHouse Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1984HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law
10/03/1984HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law
08/14/1984HouseExecutive Comment Received From Justice.
08/08/1984HouseExecutive Comment Received From State.
05/31/1984HouseExecutive Comment Requested from State, Justice.
05/29/1984HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/24/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
05/24/1984HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/24/1984 Referred to
10/04/1984 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law05/29/1984 Referred to
10/03/1984 Markup by
10/03/1984 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5728.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5728. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/24/1984)

Provides that U.S. permanent residents shall be considered as temporarily visiting abroad during periods of employment by the American University of Beirut.