Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 05/30/1984
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34]* 05/30/1984
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 05/30/1984
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/06/1984
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/13/1984
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/13/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/13/1984
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 06/20/1984
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/25/1984
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/28/1984
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/28/1984
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 09/06/1984
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/06/1984
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/1984
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/14/1984

Show cosponsors who withdrew