Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4]* 07/26/1984
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/09/1984
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 08/09/1984
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 08/09/1984
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 08/09/1984
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/09/1984
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 08/09/1984
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 08/09/1984
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/19/1984
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 09/24/1984
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 10/03/1984
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/09/1984
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 10/09/1984