Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 1983

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to establish new educational assistance programs for veterans and for members of the Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/06/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/12/1983Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
04/12/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/01/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/19/1983Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
01/06/1983Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/1983Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/1983Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/06/1983 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation02/01/1983 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/06/1983 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment04/12/1983 Referred to
04/12/1983 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.613. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/1983)

Veterans' Education Assistance Act of 1983 - Establishes a new educational assistance program for the all-volunteer force. Excludes graduates of service academies from eligibility for such assistance. Entitles veterans who are graduates of a secondary school and who have served in the armed forces on continuous active duty for at least three years to basic educational assistance. Entitles veterans of the Selected Reserve who are graduates of secondary school and who have served at least two years of continuous active duty in the armed forces and at least four years of continuous duty in the Selected Reserve to basic educational assistance. Sets forth the formula for determining the length of such assistance based on the length of time served. Entitles such veterans to a monthly assistance allowance of $200 for a full-time approved program of education. Permits the Secretary concerned to establish a higher rate of assistance, but not more than $400 a month, for individuals possessing a skill or specialty designated as being in critical shortage.

Permits enrollment, if eligible, in a program of education while an individual continues to perform his duties.

Entitles veterans who have served five or more consecutive years of active duty in addition to those required for basic educational assistance to supplemental educational assistance. Entitles veterans of the Selected Reserve who have served two or more consecutive years of active duty and four or more consecutive years of duty in the reserves in addition to that required for basic educational assistance to supplemental educational assistance.

Entitles such veterans to a monthly supplemental assistance allowance of $100 a month. Permits the provision of assistance at a higher rate, but not more than $300 monthly, to any individual entitled to basic educational assistance who has a skill or specialty in which there is a critical shortage of personnel. Permits the Secretary of Defense to authorize specified individuals to transfer to a dependent part or all of such individuals' entitlement to educational assistance. Sets forth the conditions under which transferred benefits may be provided.

Establishes a ten year delimiting period for educational assistance. Excludes time spent as a prisoner of war subsequent to discharges and time spent physically or mentally disabled. Limits educational assistance to individuals being furnished subsistence to the amount an institution would charge similarly circumstanced nonveterans. Prohibits participation in more than one program of educational assistance.

Allocates the administration and costs of such programs to the Veterans Administration, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of Defense Education Benefits Fund.

Requires the Secretary of Defense and the Administrator to submit to Congress a biennial report on the operations of such programs.

Amends the Post-Vietnam Era Veterans' Educational Assistance Act of 1977 to terminate the right to enroll in the Post-Vietnam Era Veterans' Educational Assistance Program after December 31, 1981.

Directs (rather than permits) the Secretary of each military department to establish a program to provide educational assistance to members of the Selected Reserve who agree to remain in such Reserve for at least six years. Sets forth the amount of such assistance. Requires that such assistance be given for pre-degree work at an institution of higher learning. Sets forth further eligibility requirements for such assistance. Establishes a delimiting period of ten years from the date of entitlement or from the date of separation from service, whichever comes first. Prohibits the provision of assistance to any member already receiving assistance as a member of the Senior Reserve Officers' Training Corps program or a member who fails to perform satisfactorily in training. Expands the penalties for failure to participate satisfactorily in such program to include orders to active duty.

Designates the Veterans Administration to administer such program. Directs the Secretary of Defense to report to Congress annually rather than quarterly on its operation.

Establishes in the Treasury a Department of Defense Education Benefits Fund to be administered by the Secretary of the Treasury for the accumulation of funds to finance Department education liabilities on an actuarially sound basis.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to transfer amounts from the Fund to the Administrator of Veterans Affairs and to the Secretary of Defense as necessary to make required payments.

Establishes in the Department of Defense a Department of Defense Education Benefits Board of Actuaries to: (1) report annually to the Secretary on the actuarial status of the Fund; (2) report not less than every four years to Congress and the President on the valuations and status of the fund; and (3) determine the present value of future benefits payable from the Fund.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) make periodic actuarial valuations of the educational programs; (2) determine an amortization methodology and schedule for the liquidation of gains or losses to the Fund; and (3) determine the amount necessary to be appropriated for the Fund for each fiscal year.

Sets forth other terms and conditions for administering such Fund.

Permits the Secretary concerned to grant an eligible member a leave of absence of not more than two years for such member to pursue a program of education. Sets forth the terms and conditions for such leave.

Requires the Secretary concerned to provide individual predischarge counseling which includes a discussion of educational benefit entitlements.