Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Armed Career Criminal Act of 1984

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title VII of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to provide enhanced penalties for certain persons possessing firearms after three previous convictions for burglaries or robberies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
10/23/1984Pocket Vetoed by President.
10/11/1984Presented to President.
10/04/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/01/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
09/25/1984Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-1073.
09/13/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/23/1984Pocket Vetoed by President.
10/11/1984HousePresented to President.
10/10/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/04/1984SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/02/1984SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1314.
10/01/1984HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
10/01/1984HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
09/25/1984HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 606.
09/25/1984HouseReported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-1073.
09/18/1984HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/18/1984HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/13/1984HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.1627.
09/13/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
09/13/1984HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/13/1984 Referred to
09/18/1984 Markup by
09/25/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-1073

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6248. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/13/1984)

Armed Career Criminal Act of 1984 - Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to establish a mandatory sentence of 15 years and a fine of not more than $25,000 for "armed career criminals."

Applies such penalties to any person with three prior convictions who commits or threatens to commit a robbery or burglary while in possession of a firearm.