Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill for the relief of Stephen C. Ruks.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
11/02/1983Became Private Law No: 98-4.
11/02/1983Signed by President.
10/24/1983Presented to President.
10/21/1983Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/06/1983Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment. With written report No. 98-269.
05/03/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
04/14/1983Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-59.
01/06/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
11/02/1983Became Private Law No: 98-4.
11/02/1983Signed by President.
10/24/1983HousePresented to President.
10/24/1983SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/21/1983SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/06/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment. With written report No. 98-269.
10/06/1983SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 462.
10/04/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/22/1983SenateSubcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Practice and Procedure
05/18/1983SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/05/1983SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
05/03/1983HousePassed House by Unanimous Consent.
05/03/1983HouseCalled up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
04/14/1983HousePlaced on Private Calendar No: 5.
04/14/1983HouseReported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-59.
04/14/1983HouseOrdered to be Reported.
01/06/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
01/06/1983HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/06/1983 Referred to
04/14/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-59
Senate Judiciary05/05/1983 Referred to
10/04/1983 Markup by
10/06/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-269
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Practice and Procedure05/18/1983 Referred to
09/22/1983 Markup by
09/22/1983 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.745.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.745. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/1983)

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to pay a specified sum to a named individual in full satisfaction of a claim against the United States arising out of an airplane rescue mission on behalf of the Coast Guard.