Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 04/27/1983
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 04/27/1983
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42]* 04/27/1983
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 05/04/1983
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 05/04/1983
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/04/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/04/1983
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/04/1983
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 05/04/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/04/1983
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/04/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/04/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/04/1983
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/04/1983
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/04/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/04/1983
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/04/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/04/1983
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 05/23/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/23/1983
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/23/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/23/1983
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/23/1983
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 05/23/1983
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/23/1983
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/23/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 05/23/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/23/1983
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 05/23/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/23/1983
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/23/1983
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 05/23/1983
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 05/23/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 05/23/1983
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 05/23/1983
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 05/23/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/23/1983
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/23/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/23/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 05/23/1983
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 05/23/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/23/1983
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 05/23/1983
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 05/23/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/23/1983
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 05/23/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/23/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/23/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 05/23/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/23/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/23/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/23/1983
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/23/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 05/23/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 05/23/1983
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/23/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/02/1983
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 06/02/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/02/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/02/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 06/02/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/02/1983
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/02/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/02/1983
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/02/1983
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 06/02/1983
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/02/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/02/1983
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/02/1983
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 06/02/1983
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/02/1983
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 06/02/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/26/1983
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/26/1983
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-19] 07/26/1983
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 07/26/1983
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/26/1983
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 07/26/1983
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/26/1983
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 09/19/1983
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/19/1983
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/19/1983
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 09/19/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 09/19/1983
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 09/19/1983
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 09/19/1983
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 09/19/1983
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/19/1983
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 09/19/1983
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 09/19/1983
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/19/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/19/1983
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/19/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/19/1983
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-22] 09/19/1983
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 09/19/1983
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 09/19/1983
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 09/19/1983
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 10/26/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/26/1983
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 10/26/1983
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2] 10/26/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 10/26/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 10/26/1983
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/26/1983
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/26/1983
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/26/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 10/26/1983
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/10/1983
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 11/10/1983
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 11/10/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 11/10/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/10/1983
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 11/10/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/10/1983
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 11/10/1983
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3] 11/10/1983
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 11/10/1983
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 11/10/1983
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 11/14/1983
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/14/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 11/14/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 11/14/1983
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 11/14/1983
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 11/17/1983