Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/12/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 04/19/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 04/19/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/19/1983
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/19/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 04/28/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/28/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/17/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/17/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/17/1983
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 05/23/1983
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/23/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/23/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/23/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/23/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/23/1983
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/23/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 05/23/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/25/1983
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/01/1983
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 06/01/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/01/1983
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 06/01/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 06/02/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/02/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 06/02/1983
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/06/1983
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/06/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/06/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/08/1983
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/08/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14] 06/14/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/14/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/16/1983
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-17] 06/16/1983
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/16/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/20/1983
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/23/1983
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/28/1983
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/28/1983
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/28/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/28/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 06/30/1983
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/30/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/30/1983
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/12/1983
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 07/12/1983
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-19] 07/12/1983
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/12/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/12/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 07/12/1983
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13] 07/12/1983
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 07/12/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/12/1983
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/12/1983
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 07/12/1983
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/12/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/12/1983
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/12/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 07/12/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 07/12/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/12/1983
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 07/12/1983
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/12/1983
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/12/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/12/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 07/12/1983
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 07/12/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 07/12/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/12/1983
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/12/1983
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/13/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/13/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/13/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/13/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 07/13/1983
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/13/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/13/1983
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/14/1983
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/14/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/14/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/14/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/14/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/14/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/1983
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/18/1983
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 07/18/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/18/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/19/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/19/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 07/19/1983
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 07/19/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/19/1983
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/19/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 07/19/1983
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/19/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/20/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/20/1983
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/20/1983
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/20/1983
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/20/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 07/20/1983
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 07/20/1983
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 07/26/1983
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 07/26/1983
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 07/26/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 07/26/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 07/29/1983
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 07/29/1983
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 07/29/1983
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 07/29/1983
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 09/14/1983
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/14/1983
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/14/1983
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 09/14/1983
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-8] 09/14/1983
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/14/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/14/1983
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 09/14/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/14/1983
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 09/14/1983
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/14/1983
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/29/1983
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/29/1983
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 09/29/1983
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 11/08/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 11/08/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 11/08/1983
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 11/08/1983
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 11/16/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/16/1983
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 11/16/1983
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 01/25/1984
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 01/25/1984
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 02/08/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/08/1984
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 02/08/1984
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 02/08/1984
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4] 02/08/1984
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/11/1984
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 04/11/1984
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 04/25/1984
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 05/08/1984
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 06/20/1984
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/11/1984
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/11/1984