Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 05/08/1984
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 05/14/1984
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 05/17/1984
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/17/1984
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/17/1984
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 05/17/1984
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/22/1984
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/22/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/22/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/22/1984
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/23/1984
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/23/1984
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 05/24/1984
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/24/1984
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/30/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/30/1984
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/31/1984
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/06/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/06/1984
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 06/06/1984
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/11/1984
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/11/1984
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/11/1984
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 06/11/1984
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/11/1984
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/11/1984
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 06/12/1984
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/12/1984
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 06/12/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/12/1984
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/13/1984
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/13/1984
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 06/13/1984
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 06/18/1984
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/18/1984
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/18/1984
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 06/19/1984
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/19/1984
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/19/1984
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/19/1984
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/19/1984
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/29/1984
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/29/1984
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/30/1984
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 07/30/1984
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/30/1984
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/30/1984
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/30/1984
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/30/1984
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/30/1984
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 07/30/1984
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 08/06/1984
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 08/06/1984
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4] 08/06/1984
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 08/06/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 08/06/1984
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 09/05/1984
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/05/1984
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 09/18/1984